Vero Software Inc. v. Axion Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Vero Software Inc.
Defendant: Alex Latifi and Axion Corporation
Case Number: 7:2020cv00823
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 06/26/2020. (BJB)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Carlson by Vero Software Inc.. (Gresham, Cole)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Caleb Hatch by Vero Software Inc.. (Gresham, Cole)
June 23, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3616299 (ALND B4601106734). (Gresham, Cole) Modified on 6/24/2020 (KEK).
June 23, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3616291 (ALND B4601106733). (Gresham, Cole) Modified on 6/24/2020 (KEK).
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vero Software Inc. Axion Corporation served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020 (no date on green card); Alex Latifi served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020 (no date on green card). (AKD)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Axion Corporation and Alex Latifi mailed certified mail. (AKD)
June 11, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3607942 (ALND receipt# B4601106531). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Axion Corporation, Alex Latifi, filed by Vero Software Inc..(PSM). (Gresham, Cole) Modified on 6/11/2020 (AKD).
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Vero Software Inc.. (PSM)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Vero Software Inc. (PSM)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Axion Corporation, Alex Latifi, filed by Vero Software Inc..(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vero Software Inc. v. Axion Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Latifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axion Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vero Software Inc.
Represented By: Cole Robinson Gresham
Represented By: Jay M Ezelle
Represented By: Robert J Carlson
Represented By: Caleb A Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?