Hemphill et al v. Northport, City of
Plaintiff: David Hemphill, Jerry Pruit and Michael Carter
Defendant: Northport, City of
Case Number: 7:2020cv00861
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff filed suit on June 17, 2020, but the docket sheet reflects that Plaintiff has yet to pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, on or before August 6, 2020, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any exists, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 07/30/2020. (RCP)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL (KAM)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northport, City of, filed by David Hemphill, Michael Carter, Jerry Pruit.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemphill et al v. Northport, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hemphill
Represented By: Dantwann S Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Pruit
Represented By: Dantwann S Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carter
Represented By: Dantwann S Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northport, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?