Martinez v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Martinez
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv00910
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Martinez. Aetna Life Insurance Company served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (MEB2)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Martinez. Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Williams, Miles)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company mailed certified mail (KAM)
June 26, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3618657 (ALND B4601106803) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed by Daniel Martinez.(PSM). (Martin, David) Modified on 6/26/2020 (KEK).
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Daniel Martinez. (Martin, David)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed by Daniel Martinez.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Martinez
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: David P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?