Burns v. Forest Manor Inc
Plaintiff: Virginia Burns
Defendant: 2215 Northport Opco LLC, Forest Manor Inc, Essential Health Group LLC, Shalom Lerner, 2215 Northport Propco LLC, Forest Manor Health and Rehab and 2215 Northport Opco LLC doing business as Forest Manor Health and Rehab
Case Number: 7:2020cv00948
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sanchez, Rachelle)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/8/2020. (KAM)
July 7, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3624049. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Forest Manor Inc from Tuscaloosa Circuit Court, case number 2019-901192., filed by Forest Manor Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(KAM). (Sanchez, Rachelle)
July 6, 2020 ANSWER by 2215 Northport Opco LLC, 2215 Northport Propco LLC, Essential Health Group LLC, Forest Manor Health and Rehab, Shalom Lerner. (deemed filed on 6/23/2020 in state court)(KAM)
July 6, 2020 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Virginia Burns. (deemed filed on 6/6/2020 in state court)(KAM)
July 6, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Forest Manor Health and Rehab, 2215 Northport Propco LLC, 2215 Northport Opco LLC, Shalom Lerner, Essential Health Group LLC, filed by Virginia Burns. (Deemed filed on 10/29/2019 in state court)(KAM)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Forest Manor Inc from Tuscaloosa Circuit Court, case number 2019-901192., filed by Forest Manor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Forest Manor Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2215 Northport Opco LLC
Represented By: Rachelle E. Sanchez
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Manor Inc
Represented By: Rachelle E. Sanchez
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essential Health Group LLC
Represented By: Rachelle E. Sanchez
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalom Lerner
Represented By: Rachelle E. Sanchez
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2215 Northport Propco LLC
Represented By: Rachelle E. Sanchez
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Manor Health and Rehab
Represented By: Rachelle E. Sanchez
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2215 Northport Opco LLC doing business as Forest Manor Health and Rehab
Represented By: Rachelle E. Sanchez
Represented By: John G Thompson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Burns
Represented By: Paul W Patterson, II
Represented By: James Michael Comer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?