Part Two LLC v. Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Part Two LLC
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv01047
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum of Opinion and ORDER denying #11 Part Two's Motion to Remand; Part Two hasfifteen (15) days from this Memorandums entry to respond to Owners Motion toDismiss (Doc. 4). Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/10/2020. (KAM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Latta, Forrest)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #11 . Defendant has seven (7) days from this Order's entry to respond to Plaintiff's motion. The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery #9 . Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/31/2020. (PSM)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Part Two LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Glover, R)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER #8 : Plaintiff must either file a Motion to Remand or respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by the current deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 8/20/2020. (CMB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery pending resolution of Defendant's dispositive motion by Owners Insurance Company. (Latta, Forrest)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Part Two LLC. (Glover, R)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Before this Court is Defendant's Amended Notice of Removal. #5 The Court interprets this filing as an implied motion for leave to amend the notice of removal. Defendant's implied motion #5 is hereby GRANTED. Also before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. #4 Plaintiff has fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motion. Defendant will thereafter have ten (10) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/13/2020. (PSM)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Owners Insurance Company. filed by Owners Insurance Company (Latta, Forrest)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal (Amended Notice of Removal) by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (entire Circuit Court file), #2 Exhibit B (Part II corporate info), #3 Exhibit C (LexisNexis reports), #4 Exhibit D (tax records), #5 Exhibit E (Owners corporate info), #6 Exhibit F (Guin v. Mass Mutual))(Latta, Forrest)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (policy), #2 Exhibit B (Sentinel), #3 Exhibit C (Gavrilides))(Latta, Forrest)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Defendant has fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to show cause as to why the Court should not remand this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/27/2020. (PSM)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/27/2020. (PSM)
July 23, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3635489. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa, Alabama, case number 02-cv-2020-900599, filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KEK). (Latta, Forrest) Modified on 7/23/2020 (NDAL R#B4601107333)(MEB2).
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa, Alabama, case number 02-cv-2020-900599, filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Part Two LLC v. Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Taylor Barr Johnson
Represented By: Forrest S Latta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Part Two LLC
Represented By: P Ted Colquett
Represented By: R Matt Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?