Sudduth v. Garret
Petitioner: Destiny Miranda Sudduth
Respondent: Garret
Case Number: 7:2020cv01058
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time Respondent's answer is due October 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 09/18/2020. (CLS2)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Order to Show Cause,, by Garret. (Saxon, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D Saxon, Jr on behalf of Garret (Saxon, John)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Petitioner Destiny Miranda Sudduth has filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. [1 Petitioner is presently confined in Aliceville Federal Correctional Institution in Aliceville, Alabama. On August 18, 2020, the court received Petitioner's filing fee.Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Respondent appear and show cause in writing within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/18/2020. (PSM)
August 18, 2020 Habeas Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number B4601107823 (MEB2)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/27/2020. (PSM)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Destiny Miranda Sudduth. (MEB2)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Destiny Miranda Sudduth.(MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sudduth v. Garret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Destiny Miranda Sudduth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garret
Represented By: John D Saxon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?