McDaniel v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.
Plaintiff: Creed P McDaniel
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv01064
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc..(Graham, John)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/16/2020. (PSM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 09/11/2020. (LSB)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Enter Qualified HIPAA Protective Order as stated on the telephone conference held on September 11, 2020. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 09/11/2020. (LSB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Creed P McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Tidmore, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Hipaa Order filed by Creed P McDaniel. (Tidmore, David)
September 8, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge L. Scott Coogler. Counsel are to dial 877-336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference. (LSB)
September 4, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call 877-336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference. (PSM)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2021. Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/3/2020. (PSM)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Hipaa Order by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.. (Graham, John)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 09/01/2020. (LSB)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Applicant Evan S. Abel, Esq. by Creed P McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Florida Bar, #2 Exhibit Consent of Designated Local Counsel)(Tidmore, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Applicant Howard A. Spier, Esq. by Creed P McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Florida Bar, #2 Exhibit Consent of Designated Local Counsel)(Tidmore, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Graham, John)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Before the Court are two motions for leave to appear pro hac vice. #6 and #7 Both motions fail to comply with Rule 83.1(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. The applicants fail to (1) provide a facsimile number for local counsel; and (2) provide written consent from local counsel. Accordingly, both motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/28/2020. (PSM)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J Christopher Johnston on behalf of Creed P McDaniel (Johnston, J)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Applicant Evan S. Abel, Esq. by Creed P McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Florida Bar)(Tidmore, David)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Applicant Howard A. Spier, Esq. by Creed P McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Florida Bar)(Tidmore, David)
August 25, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601108008 (AKD)
August 25, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601108007 (AKD)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/31/2020. (PSM)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.. filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc. (Graham, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc..(Graham, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3640966 (B4601107464). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc., filed by Creed P McDaniel.(PSM). (Tidmore, David) Modified on 7/31/2020 (AKD).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Creed P McDaniel. (PSM)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc., filed by Creed P McDaniel.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creed P McDaniel
Represented By: David M Tidmore
Represented By: Dennis Russell Weaver
Represented By: J Christopher Johnston
Represented By: Evan S Abel
Represented By: Howard A Spier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company Inc.
Represented By: John M Graham
Represented By: Steve A Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?