Crinel v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Petitioner: Lisa A Crinel
Respondent: Mr. Lopez, Jenkins, Ms. Haywood, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Dr. Griffin, Dr. Williamson, Patricia Bradley, Hall, Fountain, SPC/FCI Aliceville and Shoulders
Case Number: 7:2020cv01099
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Treating Respondents' response #4 as motion for summary judgment per Order #5 . (PSM)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER In response to the undersigned's prior show cause order, Respondents have filed an Answer and exhibits. The undersigned deems the case ripe for summary disposition on the basis of the defenses asserted in the respondents' answer. Petitioner shall have twenty calendar (20) days from the date of this Order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments she may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/22/2020. (PSM)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause filed by Federal Bureau Of Prisons. (Richardson, Clinton)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER This is an action on a petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Lisa A.Crinel. Petitioner has paid the filing fee.It is hereby ORDERED that the respondents appear and show cause in writing within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/2/2020. (PSM)
August 21, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number B4601107950 (KAM)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING Petitioner Lisa Crinel's pleading is deficient for the reason(s) indicated within. Petitioner must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 2241 Form)(PSM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lisa A Crinel.(MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crinel v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ms. Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau Of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dr. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dr. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SPC/FCI Aliceville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shoulders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lisa A Crinel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?