Clary v. Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc et al
Plaintiff: Billy Clary
Defendant: Harry Hyche and Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc
Case Number: 7:2020cv01138
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc, Harry Hyche Notice of Settlement (Zwilling, Edward)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. #7 Defendants are hereby GRANTED a fourteen (14) day extension to file an answer due by Monday, October 5, 2020. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/17/2020. (PSM)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/15/2020. (PSM)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc, Harry Hyche. (Zwilling, Edward)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward I Zwilling on behalf of Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc, Harry Hyche (Zwilling, Edward)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Clary. Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc served on 8/29/2020, answer due 9/19/2020; Harry Hyche served on 8/29/2020, answer due 9/19/2020. (MEB2)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc, Harry Hyche. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Billy Clary. (Hughes, David)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Billy Clary. (Hughes, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc, Harry Hyche, filed by Billy Clary.(KEK)
August 7, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3645944 (ALND reciept# B4601107624). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc, Harry Hyche, filed by Billy Clary.(KEK). (Hughes, David) Modified on 8/7/2020 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clary v. Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Hyche
Represented By: Edward I Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrys Excavating & Septic Tank Inc
Represented By: Edward I Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Clary
Represented By: David A Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?