Landin v. Bradley
Petitioner: Maria Landin
Respondent: Patricia Bradley
Case Number: 7:2020cv01203
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - On October 5, 2020, Petitioner filed a "Motion for Extension of Time [as] Time Barred," which in substance is an opposition to Respondent's motion for extension of time. (Doc. #6 ). Petitioner's motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/9/2020. (KEK)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time Time Barred by Maria Landin. (MEB2)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Respondent has filed a motion for extension of time to respond to the court's order to show cause and moves for an extension of time to respond to Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus. Doc. #4 . Respondent's motion is granted and she shall have until October 25, 2020, to file a response. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/25/2020. (KEK)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order to Show Cause, by Patricia Bradley. (Saxon, John)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Accordingly, Respondent is ORDERED to comply with the court's August 27, 2020, order within ten (10) days of the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/24/2020. (KEK)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the respondents appear and show cause in writing within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/27/2020. (KEK)
August 26, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number B4601108019. (KEK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Maria Landin.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landin v. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Landin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia Bradley
Represented By: John D Saxon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?