Patterson v. White
Plaintiff: Bradley Paul Patterson, Jr
Defendant: Neicko L White
Case Number: 7:2020cv01330
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER The plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the initial partial filing fee of $27.66 within 14 days from the entry date of this Order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/26/2020. (SRD)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing PRISONER CONSENT FORM by Bradley Paul Patterson, Jr (MEB2)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER grating motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/14/2020. (SRD)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley Paul Patterson, Jr. (KEK)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Neicko L White, filed by Bradley Paul Patterson, Jr.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neicko L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Paul Patterson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?