CEV Tuscaloosa LP v. Stillman College
Plaintiff: CEV Tuscaloosa LP
Defendant: Stillman College
Case Number: 7:2020cv01401
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Stillman College.(Steverson, Carolyn)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CEV Tuscaloosa LP. filed by CEV Tuscaloosa LP (Hahn, W)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CEV Tuscaloosa LP. Stillman College waiver sent on 10/26/2020. (Hahn, W)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stillman College. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
September 23, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3677670. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Stillman College, filed by CEV Tuscaloosa LP.(KAM). (Hahn, W)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stillman College, filed by CEV Tuscaloosa LP.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CEV Tuscaloosa LP v. Stillman College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEV Tuscaloosa LP
Represented By: Xeris Gregory
Represented By: W Patton Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stillman College
Represented By: Carolyn Williams Steverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?