Bostic v. United States of America
Petitioner: James T Bostic
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2020cv08030
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing by James T Bostic (MEB2)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James T Bostic. (MEB2)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - In accordance with the Memorandum of Opinion entered contemporaneously herewith, Petitioner's motion to vacate, set aside, or correct his sentence is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. A certificate of appealability will not be issued. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/23/2020. (KEK)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION - For the reasons stated above, the 2255 motion is due to be denied for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/23/2020. (KEK)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) 7:14-cr-201-LSC-HNJ, filed by James T Bostic.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bostic v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James T Bostic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: M Blake Milner
Represented By: John B Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?