Prince v. United States of America
Petitioner: Reginald Prince
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2020cv08031
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert John Becher, Sr on behalf of United States of America (Becher, Robert)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE to re #1 filed by United States of America. (Becher, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Petitioner Reginald Prince has filed with the Clerk of this Court a motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. #1 It is hereby ORDERED that the United States appear and file its answer in accordance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings, within forty-five (45) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/22/2020. (PSM)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) 7:18-cr-399-LSC-TMP, filed by Reginald Prince.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Ruben Sanchez
Represented By: Robert John Becher, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reginald Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?