Roberts v. Osborne et al
Plaintiff: LeeAnn Roberts
Defendant: Southeastern Professional Rodeo Association, Deon Osborne, Bill Hudson and Deodnra Rashawn L. Osborne doing business as Midwest Invitational Rodeo Association
Case Number: 7:2021cv00213
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The Court acknowledges receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal. #7 This action is DISMISSED. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/7/2021. (PSM)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 by LeeAnn Roberts. (Hodges, Jeremiah)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by LeeAnn Roberts as to Deon Osborne. (MEB2)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by LeeAnn Roberts as to Deodnra Rashawn L. Osborne. (MEB2)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Bill Hudson and Southeastern Professional Rodeo Association by LeeAnn Roberts. (MEB2)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bill Hudson, Deodnra Rashawn L. Osborne, Deon Osborne, Southeastern Professional Rodeo Association. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by LeeAnn Roberts. (Hodges, Jeremiah)
February 22, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3782251 (ALND B4601111616) related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LeeAnn Roberts.(PSM). (Hodges, Jeremiah) Modified on 2/23/2021 (KEK).
February 11, 2021 Request for service by certified mail filed by LeeAnn Roberts as stated in complaint #1 . (PSM)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LeeAnn Roberts.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Osborne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Professional Rodeo Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deon Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deodnra Rashawn L. Osborne doing business as Midwest Invitational Rodeo Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeeAnn Roberts
Represented By: Timothy M McFalls
Represented By: William V. Burkett
Represented By: Jeremiah M Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?