Doe v. RHOC Inc
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: RHOC Inc
Case Number: 7:2021cv00308
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: certain time limits apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 8/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2022. Mediation in September 2022; Pretrial conference ready in January 2023; Jury trial ready in February 2023. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/8/2021. (KAM)
June 8, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Scheduling Conference held on 6/8/2021. A separate Scheduling Order will be entered by the court. (KLL)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2021 03:00 PM before Judge R David Proctor. The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant are DIRECTED to dial-in to the conference by calling 866-434-5269 at the scheduled time. The access code is 6022965. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/3/2021. (KAM)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 INITIAL ORDER - Unless expressly directed otherwise, the parties SHALL comply with all provisions of this Initial Order in the litigation of this action. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/25/2021. (KEK)
May 19, 2021 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kirby, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case; the telephone conference set for 5/19/2021 is cancelled. (KAM)
May 17, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:00 AM on Wednesday, May 19, 2021; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled (ASL)
May 6, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RHOC Inc. (Bolvig, C)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are ORDERED to file their Rule 26 Report on or before May 19, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 05/05/2021. (SUH)
May 4, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to conduct Rule 26(f) Confernce by John Doe. (Kirby, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher H Jones terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 04/16/2021. (SUH)
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RHOC Inc. (Jones, Christopher)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER #15 Motion to Set Aside Default and for extension of time to answer the complaint is GRANTED: Entry of Default against RHOC Inc is SET ASIDE; Defendant is ORDERED to file an amended answer to the complaint on or before 5/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 4/15/2021. (KAM)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default and for Extension of Time to Amend Answer to Complaint by RHOC Inc. (Bolvig, C)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 5/23/2021 unless they unanimously consent to the dispositive jurisdiction of a magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 5/19/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 5/19/ 2021, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 4/14/2021. (KAM)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on April 14, 2021. (ASL)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RHOC Inc.(Jones, Christopher)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Christopher)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 **SET ASIDE see order #16 **Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RHOC Inc (KAM) Modified on 4/15/2021 (KAM).
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, RHOC, Inc. by John Doe. (Kirby, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/8/2021 (KAM, ).
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Chandler Osborn Kirby on behalf of John Doe (Kirby, Chandler)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on or before April 16, 2021, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any exists, as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 4/7/2021. (KAM)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. RHOC Inc served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (KAM)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to proceed anonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/2/2021. (KAM)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RHOC Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by John Doe. (MEB2)
March 1, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3786689. related document #1 COMPLAINT against RHOC Inc, filed by John Doe.(KEK). (Kirby, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY by John Doe. (KEK)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RHOC Inc, filed by John Doe.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. RHOC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHOC Inc
Represented By: C Peter Bolvig, III
Represented By: Christopher H Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jeffrey C Kirby
Represented By: Chandler Osborn Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?