Tuscaloosa Hyundai Inc v. Hyundai Motor America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tuscaloosa Hyundai Inc
Defendant: Genesis Motor America LLC and Hyundai Motor America Inc
Case Number: 7:2021cv00571
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/31/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2022. Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2022. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/2/2021. (PSM)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bledsoe, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Ryan L. Ford has moved for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 . His motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/17/2021. (PSM)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan L. Ford by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to PHV for Ryan Ford (, #2 Receipt for PHV Fee)(Bledsoe, Robert)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tuscaloosa Hyundai Inc. filed by Tuscaloosa Hyundai Inc (Ingram, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3830794 (B4601113064). (Bledsoe, Robert) Modified on 5/3/2021 (MEB2).
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Genesis Motor America LLC.(Bledsoe, Robert)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Hyundai Motor America Inc.(Bledsoe, Robert)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc. filed by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc (Bledsoe, Robert)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/23/2021. (PSM)
April 23, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3825692 (B4601112879). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa County, case number 63-cv-2021-900229., filed by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (PSM). (Bledsoe, Robert) Modified on 4/26/2021 (MEB2).
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa County, case number 63-cv-2021-900229., filed by Genesis Motor America LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuscaloosa Hyundai Inc v. Hyundai Motor America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuscaloosa Hyundai Inc
Represented By: David Anthony Butler
Represented By: Jeffrey L Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Motor America LLC
Represented By: Robert William Bledsoe
Represented By: Bryan A Coleman
Represented By: John A Smyth, III
Represented By: Ryan Lee Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Inc
Represented By: Robert William Bledsoe
Represented By: Bryan A Coleman
Represented By: John A Smyth, III
Represented By: Ryan Lee Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?