Snodgrass v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Plaintiff: Robert Snodgrass
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Case Number: 7:2021cv00618
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew A. Clabots by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Little, Jonathan)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ian Morrison by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Little, Jonathan)
July 1, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3875766. (Little, Jonathan)
July 1, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3875770. (Little, Jonathan)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than August 1, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after August 1, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on July 21, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 866-390-1828 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 9262283. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/25/21. (MRR, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on June 25, 2021. (ASL)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendant Prudential's Answer and Affirmative and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The.(Little, Jonathan)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's unopposed #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant is ORDERED to respond to the complaint on or before June 21, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 05/24/2021. (SUH)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (Little, Jonathan)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Little, Jonathan)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Snodgrass. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (JLC)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
May 5, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3834010 (ALND B4601113173) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America, The, filed by Robert Snodgrass.(KAM). (Blocker, Ariel) Modified on 5/6/2021 (KEK).
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Robert Snodgrass. (KAM)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America, The, filed by Robert Snodgrass.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snodgrass v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Represented By: Jonathan R Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Snodgrass
Represented By: Ariel S Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?