Peterson v. Brooks et al
Plaintiff: Eric Dashon Peterson
Defendant: Raven Brooks and Jonathan Williams
Case Number: 7:2021cv00654
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - For good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for extension of time to pay his initial partial filing fee (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED. The plaintiff shall pay his initial partial filing fee no later than July 26, 2021, and is reminded of his obligation to return a signed Prisoner Consent Form along with payment of his partial filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/28/2021. (MEB2)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by Eric Dashon Peterson. (JLC)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to pay an Initial Partial Filing Fee of $7.50 in order to commence this action, plaintiff is also required to sign and return the attached Prisoner Consent Form within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order or the complaint will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/11/2021. (JLC)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Eric Dashon Peterson. (JLC)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raven Brooks, Jonathan Williams, filed by Eric Dashon Peterson.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Brooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Dashon Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raven Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?