Bush v. Aramark Services Inc
Plaintiff: Atasha Bush
Defendant: Aramark Services Inc
Case Number: 7:2021cv00829
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The parties have reported to the Court that a settlement has been reached inthis matter. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Any partymay, for good cause shown, reopen this action within sixty (60) days from the dateof this Order. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/10/2021. (PSM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Case Resolved by Aramark Services Inc. filed by Aramark Services Inc (Larson, Celeste)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/21/2021. (PSM)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aramark Services Inc. filed by Aramark Services Inc (Larson, Celeste)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #7 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 7/16/2021. (CMB)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Aramark Services Inc. (Larson, Celeste)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atasha Bush. Aramark Services Inc served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (KEK)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 Request for service by certified mail filed by Atasha Bush. (Palmer, Leslie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aramark Services Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/23/21. (MRR, )
June 18, 2021 Request for service by certified mail within the body of #1 Complaint filed by Atasha Bush. (MEB2)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Atasha Bush. (MEB2)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aramark Services Inc, filed by Atasha Bush. (MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Aramark Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atasha Bush
Represented By: Leslie A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Services Inc
Represented By: Celeste P Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?