Bey v. Horton et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Lee Alexander Bey
Defendant: WS Horton and Castleberry
Case Number: 7:2021cv01093
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER This case is before the court on Plaintiffs failure to comply with the courts orders. (Docs. # 3, 5). The court twice directed Plaintiff to pay a total of $400 ($350 filing fee + $50 administrative fee) to the Clerk of the Court. (Docs. # 3, 5); this action shall be, and is, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/30/2021. (KAM)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Plaintiff SHALL pay a total of $400 ($350 filing fee + $50 administrative fee) to the Clerk of the Court on or before September 28, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/16/2021. (KAM)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Castleberry, WS Horton, and notice of change of address filed by Dennis Lee Alexander Bey.(KAM)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - As both Plaintiff and his wife earn $800 per week, together they earn approximately $80,000 per year. Therefore, the motion (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff SHALL pay a total of $400 ($350 filing fee + $50 administrative fee) to the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days. Also within thirty (30) days, Plaintiff SHALL file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/12/2021. (KEK)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Lee Alexander Bey. (KEK)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Castleberry, WS Horton, filed by Dennis Lee Alexander Bey.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Horton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lee Alexander Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WS Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?