Carter v. State of Alabama
Petitioner: Roderick Carter
Respondent: State of Alabama
Case Number: 7:2021cv01220
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Nicholas A Danella
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as client has paid the $5.00 filing fee on September 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 09/28/2021. (AKD)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roderick Carter. (AKD)
September 23, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number B4601115939 (AKD)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend Record by Roderick Carter. (AKD)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING-The petitioner failed to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the filing fee of $5.00. The petitioner must either file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $5.00. An application to proceed in forma pauperis must be verified by an authorized officer of the institution and must be accompanied by a certified copy of prison account statements for the last six months. Petitioner must correct the deficient pleading within 30 days from the entry date of this notice or the court will dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 09/14/2021. (AKD)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Roderick Carter.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roderick Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?