Crittenden v. Miles et al
Plaintiff: Alexander O'Bryan Crittenden
Defendant: Miles, Keller, Kymberly Porter and Tuscaloosa County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 7:2021cv01223
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Accordingly, it is ORDERED that on or before December 3, 2021, Crittenden shall file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies and complies with the instructions outlined above. Crittenden is specifically cautioned that his failure to timely file an amended complaint in accordance with these directives and by this deadline will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 11/3/2021. (KEK)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Keller, Miles, Tuscaloosa County Sheriff's Department, filed by Alexander O'Bryan Crittenden.(KAM)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER On or before October 12, 2021, Crittenden shall file an amendedcomplaint that cures the deficiencies and complies with the instructions outlined within this order; #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/21/2021. (KAM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander O'Bryan Crittenden. (KAM)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keller, Miles, Kymberly Porter, filed by Alexander O'Bryan Crittenden.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crittenden v. Miles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander O'Bryan Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kymberly Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuscaloosa County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?