HDI Global Insurance Company v. Kuehne + Nagel (AG & Co) KG et al
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Defendant: Kuehne + Nagel (AG & Co) KG and Kuehne + Nagel Inc
Case Number: 7:2021cv01410
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 31325
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Insurance Company. Kuehne Nagel Inc served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. (KAM)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kuehne Nagel (AG & Co) KG. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kuehne Nagel Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 STATEMENT by HDI Global Insurance Company. (KEK)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by HDI Global Insurance Company. (KEK)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kuehne Nagel (AG & Co) KG, Kuehne Nagel Inc (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ALND B4601116475), filed by HDI Global Insurance Company.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI Global Insurance Company v. Kuehne + Nagel (AG & Co) KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Represented By: Randall S Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuehne + Nagel (AG & Co) KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuehne + Nagel Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?