United States of America v. Faught et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kenneth L Faught, Jr and Arrice K Faught
Case Number: 7:2022cv00150
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 7402 Refund of Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Arrice K Faught, Kenneth L Faught, Jr.(Staggs, Shannon)
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kenneth L Faught, Jr served on 3/12/2022, answer due 4/2/2022. (Sheer, Margaret)
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Arrice K Faught served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022. (Sheer, Margaret)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Arrice K Faught, Kenneth L Faught, Jr. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arrice K Faught, Kenneth L Faught, Jr, filed by United States of America.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Faught et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Sheer
Represented By: Richard E O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L Faught, Jr
Represented By: Shannon Clay Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrice K Faught
Represented By: Shannon Clay Staggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?