English v. Neely et al
Plaintiff: Tanya L. English
Defendant: Neely, Garcia, Li and Garrett
Case Number: 7:2022cv01526
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Plaintiff Tanya L. English has filed a #6 motion to withdraw the above-styled case, which the court construes as a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/24/2023. (KAM)
January 20, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw Case by Tanya L. English. (KAM)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER For god cause show, English's #4 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. English shall have until January 31, 2023 to pay the initial partial filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/29/2022. (KSS)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay fees by Tanya L. English. (KAM)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee of $56.26, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days, Motions terminated: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tanya L. English. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/05/2022. (KAM)
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tanya L. English. (KAM)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garcia, Garrett, Li, Neely, filed by Tanya L. English.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. Neely et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya L. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?