Pugh v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: Shameca La'Shawn Pugh
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2023cv00100
Filed: January 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00262. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 20, 2023 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shameca La'Shawn Pugh. Doc# 2 and 3 orders. Envelope states "RTS refused" (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/23/2023.]
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring case to Judge Marcia A Crone. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/2023. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/23/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer the above-styled action to the Clerk of the United States District court for the Northern District of Alabama, Tuscaloosa Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 12/29/2022. (bjc, )[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/23/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 12/29/2022. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/23/2023.]
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 28:2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shameca La'Shawn Pugh.(bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/23/2023.]
June 16, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/23/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pugh v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shameca La'Shawn Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?