State of Alabama, et al v. Ala. Wood Treating, et al

Case Number: 1:1985cv00642
Filed: May 6, 1985
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2011 576 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 575 Joint Motion for Dismissal. All claims by & against Vertellus & the Reilly entities asserted in this action by any party at any time are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/24/2011. (tot)
November 15, 2010 570 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 569 MOTION to Dismiss as set out. Plfs' claims against Dft Alabama Wood Treating Corporation are DISMISSED w/prejudice as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this action for statistical purposes in light of the consent decree as set out. The court will retain jurisdiction as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/15/10. (tot)
November 8, 2010 567 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE entered as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/8/10. (tot)
April 5, 2010 444 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plfs' 441 Motion to Quash & 441 Motion for Protective Order is MOOT as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/5/10. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Alabama, et al v. Ala. Wood Treating, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?