Stallworth et al v. Bryant

Plaintiff: Freddie Lee Stallworth and Charlen A. Stallworth
Defendant: Jackie Joe Bryant
Case Number: 1:2004cv00663
Filed: October 18, 2004
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
0 Judge: William E Cassady
1 Judge: W B Hand
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2006. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2006 26 Clerk's Notice of Closing pursuant to Stipulation of Dismisal #25 (srr, )
January 27, 2006 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Freddie Lee Stallworth, Charlen A. Stallworth, Jackie Joe Bryant. (Riis, J.)
December 27, 2005 24 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Kristi K. DuBose and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix BH-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (tgw)
December 16, 2005 REFERRAL OF #23 Position Regarding Settlement to Judge DuBose. (srr, )
December 15, 2005 23 Position Regarding Settlement (Joint Statement) filed by Freddie Lee Stallworth, Charlen A. Stallworth, Jackie Joe Bryant. (Riis, J.)
November 15, 2005 22 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Discovery Pleading (Defendant's Expert Disclosures) filed by Jackie Joe Bryant.(Riis, J.)
July 26, 2005 21 Featured Case AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2006 09:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge W. B. Hand. Discovery cutoff 12/15/2005. Motions due by 12/30/2005. Jury Selection set for 3/7/2006 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for month of March 2007. Ett 2 1/2 days. Position Regarding Settlement due by 12/15/2005. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/25/05. (srr, )
July 25, 2005 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kristi K. DuBose : Scheduling Conference held on 7/25/2005. (khc, )
July 21, 2005 19 MOTION to Amend #7 Scheduling Order by Freddie Lee Stallworth, Charlen A. Stallworth. Referred to Judge DuBose(srr, )
July 19, 2005 18 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Jackie Joe Bryant.(Riis, J.)
July 18, 2005 17 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Notices of Depositions Duces Tecum filed by Jackie Joe Bryant.(Riis, J.)
July 18, 2005 16 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Jackie Joe Bryant.(Riis, J.)
July 1, 2005 15 Notice of Filing Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production filed by Jackie Joe Bryant.(Riis, J.)
June 29, 2005 14 NOTICE by Jackie Joe Bryant of Service of Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum (Riis, J.)
May 10, 2005 13 Notice of Filing Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production filed by Jackie Joe Bryant.(Riis, J.)
March 14, 2005 12 Proof of Service of non-party subpoena filed by Jackie Joe Bryant. Service on Dr. Armita Yearwood by Certified Mail on March 10, 2005. (Riis, J.)
March 11, 2005 11 Proof of Service of non-party subpoena filed by Jackie Joe Bryant.; Service on Dr. Aubrey A. Odom by Certified Mail on March 3, 2005. (Riis, J.)
March 11, 2005 10 Proof of Service of non-party subpoenas filed by Jackie Joe Bryant. Service on Dr. Radha Krothapalli by Certified Mail on March 2, 2005. (Riis, J.)
February 28, 2005 9 Notice of Filing Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Jackie Joe Bryant.(Riis, J.)
February 17, 2005 8 Notice of Filing Notices of Video Depositions filed by Jackie Joe Bryant.(Riis, J.)
January 25, 2005 7 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2005 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge W. B. Hand.; Amended Pleadings due by 5/2/2005.; Discovery cutoff 8/1/2005.; Motions due by 8/15/2005.; Jury Selection set for 11/1/2005 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 5B before Senior Judge W. B. Hand.; Jury Trial set for sometime during the month of November 2005 before Senior Judge W. B. Hand.; Position Regarding Settlement due by 8/1/2005.; Signed by Judge Kristi D. Lee on 1/25/05.; (Attachments: #1 Judge Hand's Pretrial Order)(sdb)
January 25, 2005 6 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Judge W. B. Hand and Kristi D. Lee for all further proceedings. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix BH-L after the case number on all future pleadings.; Signed by Judge Kristi D. Lee on 1/25/05. (sdb)
January 7, 2005 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Riis, J.)
November 29, 2004 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/12/2005.(mca, )
November 29, 2004 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 1/12/2005. (Attachments:, #1 Consent to Jurisidiction of M/J form)(mca, )
November 11, 2004 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Jackie Joe Bryant.(Riis, J.)
October 18, 2004 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jackie Joe Bryant from Conecuh County, case number CV-04-115. ( Filing fee $ 150, Receipt number 48791.), filed by Jackie Joe Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Fee(Riis, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallworth et al v. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Lee Stallworth
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlen A. Stallworth
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Joe Bryant
Represented By: J. Burruss Riis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?