Lindsay v. Mosley

Case Number: 1:2006cv00064
Filed: February 2, 2006
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: W. B. Hand
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 37 TO DENY MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Roger Howard Lindsay, Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/7/09. (Clerk mailed copy to Appellant.) Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/30/09. (Clerk mailed Appellant copy and e-mailed copy to USCA). (jal)
April 7, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 37 TO DENY MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Roger Howard Lindsay, Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2009Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/7/09. (Clerk mailed copy to Appellant.) (jal)
March 2, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf's Complaint be DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/2/09. (copy mailed to Pet on 3/3/09) (tot)
January 29, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Pet's rights were not violated & that his request for habeas corpus relief should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/29/09. (copy mailed to Pet on 1/30/09) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsay v. Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?