Wilson v. Robinson

Case Number: 1:2006cv00111
Filed: April 27, 2006
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/8/09. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
April 7, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Kenneth Wilson, recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice as set out. Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/7/09. (copy mailed) (cmj)
February 3, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for plaintiff to advise the Court in writing whether he desires to continue this litigation and if so his plans for litigation this action, given that the sole defendant is deceased. ( Response to order deadline set for 3/3/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/3/09. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?