Muhammad v. Dale

Case Number: 1:2006cv00315
Filed: May 18, 2006
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 145 Motion for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 6/9/09. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
October 9, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Motion to Leave of the Court Amend Reconsideration of De Novo Trial Relief; denying 112 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; the Court DIRECTS the Commissioner of AL Dept of Corrections every month to w/draw 20% o f the preceding months income credited to the prisoner's inmate account and remit to the Clerk every time the account exceeds $10.00 until the $455.00 fee has been paid. The Clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the Commissioner and to the Business Manager of the institution where plaintiff is incarcerated. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 10/8/08. (srr) (copies to ADOC, Bus. Mgr. of Prison, Appellant, Finance)
September 15, 2008 101 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's documents entitled Clarification (Doc. 66), Default Judgment, Freed, Monetary Relief, Requested (Doc. 74), Motion to Leave of Court Amend Relief in Plaintiff Favor (Doc. 75), Motion to Leave of Court Plaintiff Amend Motion for Objection, and Default Pursuant FRCP 55" (Doc. 76) be and are herebyDENIED. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 9/15/08. Copy mailed to Plaintiff (tgw)
September 5, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS stating it is recommended that Plaintiff's documents entitled "Clarification" 66 , "Default Judgment, Freed, Monetary Relief, Requested" 74 , "Motion to Leave of Court Amend Relief in Plainti ffFavor" 75 , & "Motion to Leave of Court Plaintiff Amend Motion for Objection, and Default Pursuant FRCP 55" 76 be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/5/08. Copies to parties. (mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?