Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. F/V Miss Angela
Defendant: F/V Miss Angela
Petitioner: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Not Yet Classified: Steiner Shipyard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00028
Filed: January 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER, GRANTING plaintiff's motion for order of distribution of proceeds of sale of the F/V MISS ANGELA, and finding #28 request for default to be MOOT. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that judgment as to the proceeds of the sale be and is hereby entered in favor of Caterpillar Financial Corporation in the sum of $230,000.00. The clerk of court is hereby directed to immediately disburse to Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation the proceeds of the sale of the F/V MISS ANGELA, c/o of P. Vincent Gaddy with Armbrecht Jackson LLP, Post Office Box 290, Mobile, Alabama 36601. There being no further issues pending before the court, the clerk of court is directed to close this action. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 06/06/2007. (mab)
May 24, 2007 Filing 29 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds , Distribution of Proceeds of Sale of the F/V MISS ANGELA, by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaddy, P.)
May 3, 2007 Filing 28 U. S. Marshal BILL OF SALE. (tot)
May 3, 2007 Filing 27 USM RETURN OF SERVICE re: Sale of Vessel on 4/18/07. (tot)
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re: #24 Motion to Confirm Sale. The sale of the F/V MISS ANGELA to Marc Estes is CONFIRMED as set out. The USM is directed to issue a bill of sale as set out. The F/V MISS ANGELA is released from seizure, & the court appointed, substitute custodian, Steiner Shipyard, Inc., shall deliver possession of the F/V MISS ANGELA to Marc Estes as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/30/07. (copy to Plf's attny & 3 cert. to USM on 4/30/07) (tot)
April 30, 2007 Filing 25 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against F/V Miss Angela. (Gaddy, P.)
April 26, 2007 Filing 24 MOTION to Confirm Sale , Seeking Confirmation of Sale and Release and Conveyance of the F/V MISS ANGELA by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaddy, P.)
April 23, 2007 Filing 23 NOTICE by Clerk to Custodian of Vessel, Steiner Shipyard, Inc., directing that written notice be given within 5 days re: filing of claims (mab)
April 2, 2007 Filing 22 USM RETURN OF SERVICE, Advertisement Notice of Sale served 4/2/07 on Mobile Press Register. (tot)
March 20, 2007 Filing 21 WRIT of Venditioni Exponas Issued to USM for publication in the Mobile Register on the following dates: 4/2, 4/3, 4/4, 4/9, 4/10 & 4/11/07. (Attachment: #1 Notice of U. S. Marshal's Sale of Vessel) (original & 2 cert. copies of the writ w/copies of notice to USM on 3/20/07) (tot)
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECREE ORDERING SALE OF VESSEL, it is ORDERED that the F/V MISS ANGELA be condemned & sold as set out; that venditioni exponas issue as set out, & the sale of the vessel take place on 4/18/07 at noon after advertising notices of the sale are published as set out in the Mobile Register. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/19/07. (copy to Plf's attny on 3/20/07; 3 cert. to USM on 3/20/07) (tot)
March 19, 2007 Filing 19 NOTICE by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation of Filing (Attachments: #1 Decree Ordering Sale of Vessel#2 Sale by U.S. Marshal and Clerk's Notice to file Claims#3 Writ of Venditioni) (Gaddy, P.)
March 19, 2007 Filing 18 MOTION for Order of Sale of Vessel by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Gaddy, P.)
March 6, 2007 Filing 17 USM RETURN OF SERVICE, Advertisement-Notice of Arrest served 2/15/07 as to Mobile Press Register. (tot)
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF PUBLICATION OF THE ACTION AGAINST AND ARREST OF THE F/V MISS ANGELA, granting #15 Motion for Service by Publication. Publication Order furnished to USM for publication of action in Mobile Press Register for the following dates: 2/21,22,23/07 & 2/28, 3/1 & 2/07. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 02/06/2007. (Attachment: #1 Notice of Arrest) (mab)
January 29, 2007 Filing 15 MOTION for Service by Publication by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Notice of Action Against and Arrest of Vessel) (Gaddy, P.)
January 24, 2007 Filing 12 Notice of Commencement of Suit against F/V MISS ANGELA filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (Gaddy, P.)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Plf's #10 Motion to Direct Manner of Notice is granted as set out. It is ORDERED that service of the Verified Complaint in this action upon the F/V MISS ANGELA & upon Gazzier Shipyard, Inc., constitutes actual notice in accordance w/the provisions of 46 U.S.C. Sec. 31325(d)(1)(B) & (C). It is further ORDERED that Plf give actual notice of this action & of the arrest of the F/V MISS ANGELA to those persons and entities enumerated in 46 U.S.C. Sec. 31325(d)(1)(B) & C, if any, by certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/23/07. (tot)
January 22, 2007 Filing 14 USM RETURN OF SERVICE of Writ of Arrest & Verified Complaint; F/V MISS ANGELA served 1/18/07. (tot)
January 22, 2007 Filing 13 USM RETURN OF SERVICE of Motion & Order Appointing Substitute Custodian; Russell Steiner, Steiner Shipyard, Inc., served 1/18/07. (tot)
January 22, 2007 Filing 10 MOTION to Direct Mode and Manner of Notice by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaddy, P.)
January 11, 2007 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (Bivins, Sonja)
January 10, 2007 Filing 8 WRIT of Arrest issued to USM as to F/V MISS ANGELA as set out. (Copy to Plf's attny; original & 2 copies to USM on 1/10/07) (tot)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN, Plf's #2 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian is GRANTED. The USM is authorized & directed to surrender possession of the vessel to Steiner Shipyard, Inc. Steiner Shipyard, Inc., is appointed as substitute custodian as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/10/07. (copy to Plf's attny & 3 cert. copies to USM on 1/10/07) (tot)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR WRIT OF ARREST, Plf's #3 Motion for Issuance of Writ of Arrest is GRANTED. Clerk is ORDERED to issue writ of arrest against the F/V MISS ANGELA as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/10/07. (copy to Plf's attny & 3 cert. copies to USM on 1/10/07) (tot)
January 10, 2007 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade : Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (jts)
January 10, 2007 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement filed by Petitioner Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Gaddy, P.)
January 10, 2007 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Writ of Arrest) (Gaddy, P.)
January 10, 2007 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gaddy, P.)
January 10, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , Verified, against all defendants ( Receipt number 005574, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Gaddy, P.) Additional attachment added on 1/11/2007: Civil Cover Sheet (tot,).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. F/V Miss Angela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Steiner Shipyard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: P. Vincent Gaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Miss Angela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?