American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. v. The Evolene Co., LLC, et al

Plaintiff: American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Susan Marino, The Evoleno Co., LLC, Jay Turek and Robert Vetkoetter
Case Number: 1:2007cv00035
Filed: January 12, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2008 150 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying the 148 MOTION to Vacate Judgment filed by Susan Marino. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/10/08. (tgw)
December 1, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 135 Motion to Amend Findings and Conclusions and/or to Amend Judgment and/or for New Trial; denying 136 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/1/08. (tgw)
November 24, 2008 144 Opinion or Order of the Court Order: The Court previously granted the Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment as to liability. The plaintiff's motion as to damages is GRANTED in the amount of $150,000 and as to declaratory relief is GRANTED as set out. In all other respects, the motion for default judgment is denied. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 11/24/08. (tgw)
October 23, 2008 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to the following Motions 123 Motion to Dismiss & 125 Motion for Default Judgment: the plaintiff's motions to dismiss counterclaims and for entry of default judgment are GRANTED as set out. The clerk is directed to enter default agai nst Evoleno. A HEARING for the purposes of allowing the plaintiff to prove its damages, and of determining the language of any declaratory judgment or order for an accounting, will be held on November 20, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2C. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 10/23/08. Copies to parties & CRD. (mpp)
September 16, 2008 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 101 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 9/16/08. Copy mailed to Susan Marino (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. v. The Evolene Co., LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Marino
Represented By: George M. Zoghby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Evoleno Co., LLC
Represented By: George M. Zoghby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Turek
Represented By: Michael D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vetkoetter
Represented By: George M. Zoghby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Micheal Stewart Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?