Lynn v. Romar Marina Club, LLC

Plaintiff: Brad Lynn
Defendant: Romar Marina Club, LLC, Michael Specchio and H. Ray Hix, Jr.
Counter Claimant: H. Ray Hix, Jr.
Counter Defendant: Brad Lynn
Case Number: 1:2007cv00173
Filed: March 6, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2010 336 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 250 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Romar Marina Club, LLC, Michael Specchio stating the Court withheld a decision on the motion for summary judgment as to count six pending additional argument at the pre-trial conference. At this point neither party has addressed the facts related to an additional element as set out. Accordingly, Specchio/RMCs motion for summary judgment is DENIED as to Count Six. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/4/2010. Copies to parties. (mpp)
December 1, 2009 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered re: 250 Specchio and RMC's Motion for Summary Judgment; 253 Lynn's Motion for Summary Judgment; 256 Hix's Motion for Summary Judgment; and 259 HSK's Motion for Summary Judgment. Lynns motion for summary jud gment as to Defendant Hix counterclaims is GRANTED; Defendant Hix motion for summary judgment as to Lynns negligent loss/intentional destruction claim (count ten) is MOOT; Defendant Hix motion for summary judgment as to Lynns claims for ALSLA breach of standard of care (count three) is DENIED; Defendant Hix motion for summary judgment as Lynns claim of fraudulent suppression (count four), breach of fiduciary duty (count five), wantonness(count 7), promissory fraud (count nine), conversion (count eleven) and civil conspiracy (count twelve) is GRANTED;Defendant Specchio/RMCs motion for summary judgment as to Lynns negligent loss/intentional destruction claim is MOOT; Defendant Specchio/RMCs motion for summary judgment as to Lynns claims for i nterference with contractual/business relations (count eight),promissory fraud (count nine), wantonness (count seven), conversion (counteleven) and civil conspiracy (count twelve) is GRANTED; Defendant Specchio/RMCs motion for summary judgment as to Lynns claim of breach of fiduciary duty is carried to trial; Defendant HSKs motion for summary judgment as to Lynns claim for negligent loss/intentional destruction is MOOT; and Defendant HSKs motion for summary judgment as to Lynns claims against it for fraudulent suppression (count four), breach of fiduciary duty(count five), wantonness (count seven), conversion (count eleven) and civil conspiracy (count twelve) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/1/09. (cmj)
July 8, 2009 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 135 Motion for Summary Judgment; 143 Motion for Summary Judgment; 147 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 153 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs motion to strike is DENIED and Defendant Specchios Motion to Adopt Thomas Marrs Affidavit is GRANTED. For the reasons set forth, Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment as to Count One against Defendant Hix is DENIED and Hixs motion for summary judgment as to Count One is GRANTED. Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment as to Count Two against Defendant Specchio is DENIED and Specchios motion for summary judgment as to Count Two is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/8/09. (cmj)
May 21, 2009 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 203 Motion to Compel as set out. Having made the finding, however, does not mean that the deponents and plaintiff are without recourse under the rules of civil procedure Accordingly, counsel for the deponents and counsel for the plaintiff are to file their responses to the motion to compel, if they are unable to work out any remaining disputes with the moving party, on or before May 28, 2009. Briefing on this matter will then be CLOSED. Counsel for defendant Hix is ordered to serve a copy of this order on counsel for the deponents, Kelly A. McGrifff, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/21/09. (cmj)
April 1, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 166 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/1/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynn v. Romar Marina Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Lynn
Represented By: Utopia Conger Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romar Marina Club, LLC
Represented By: Archibald T. Reeves, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Specchio
Represented By: Archibald T. Reeves, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ray Hix, Jr.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: H. Ray Hix, Jr.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Brad Lynn
Represented By: Utopia Conger Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?