Johnson v. Cummings et al

Petitioner: Ranny L. Johnson
Respondent: John Cummings and Troy King
Case Number: 1:2007cv00188
Filed: March 9, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Clarke
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ranny L. Johnson, recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss the claims in his original petition be granted as they are time-barre d and that his Motion to Amend and his Motion to Transfer be denied. To the extent that Johnson seeks to challenge the judgment rendered by the Circuit Court of Houston County, he should file a new federal habeas petition with the District Court for the Middle District of Alabama as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/25/2010. (copy to Petitioner) (cmj)
March 1, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ranny L. Johnson, recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss the claims in his original petition be granted as tey are time-barred and that his Motion to Amend and his Motion to Transfer be denied. To the extent that Johnson seeks to challenge the judgment rendered by the Circuit Court of Houston County, he should file a new federal habeas petition with the District Court for the Middle District of Alabama as set out. Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/26/2010. (copy to petitioner) (cmj)
April 22, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 12 MOTION for Hearing by Ranny L. Johnson denying 11 MOTION for respondents to serve exhibits filed by Ranny L. Johnson The clerk is directed to forward a copy of the referenced exhibits to petitioner. Petitioner to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the statute of limitations as set out. ( Show cause deadline set for 5/26/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/21/09. (copy of order and exhibits mailed to Ranny Johnson) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cummings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Cummings
Represented By: Jean A. Therkelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy King
Represented By: Jean A. Therkelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ranny L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?