Scurtu et al v. International Student Exchange et al

Plaintiff: Cornelia Grozav and Lina Scurtu
Defendant: International Student Exchange, Wendco, Corp. and Hospitality And Catering Management Services
Case Number: 1:2007cv00410
Filed: June 5, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 175 Motion to Vacate, or, in the Alternative, to Modify Arbitration Award. The arbitrator's award entered on January 25, 2012 and clarified on July11, 2012 is confirmed. A separate judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/13/2012. (tgw)
June 19, 2012 172 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 171 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Hospitality And Catering Management Services. (Attorney Thomas Jay Woodford terminated) HCMS is ordered by 7/6/2012 to notify the Court via notice of appearance the name of counsel it has reta ined to represent its interest in this action. Plaintiffs are ordered to file a notice in this District Court attaching a copy of the arbitrators ruling and final judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/19/2012. Copy mailed to Paul Cohen, Hospitality & Catering Services, Inc., 21150 Canalport Avenue, Suite 3-A1, Chicago, IL 60608. (tgw)
October 26, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 153 MOTION to Reopen Case and Set Trial Date; Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt filed by Cornelia Grozav, Lina Scurtu. The Motion for Contempt is denied as further set out in Order. In light of the foregoing considerations, and the dea rth of evidence that the parties havemade any good-faith effort to resolve their differences concerning the HCMS settlement before once again rushing to this Court for intercession, counsel for plaintiffs and HCMS are ordered to meet in person (preferably with the arbitrators presence), to confer in good faith concerning thestatus of the settlement, and to file a joint status report on or before November 15, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/26/2011. (mbp)
February 14, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 125 Renewed Motion to Dismiss filed by Wendco, Corp., Hospitality And Catering Management Services. Plaintiffs are ordered by 3/3/2011 to file a supplemental submission regarding their inability to pay (as set out). Alternatively, plaintiffs may satisfy their obligations under this Order by making a sufficient payment to the arbitrator & by filing proof to that effect by the 3/3/2011 deadline. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/11/2011. (tgw)
October 18, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 123 Status Report. If subsequent monthly status reports do not include an adequate showing to address the concerns set out, this Court will not hesitate to issue a show cause order to plaintiffs to explain why their conduct in the aftermath of the July 27 Order does not warrant imposition of sanctions, up to and including dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/18/10. (tgw)
July 27, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 111 MOTION Proceed with Claims in Judicial Forum; denying 112 MOTION to Dismiss; denying 115 MOTION to Strike. The referral to the arbitrator remains in place & defendants are ordered to continue filing monthly status reports, on or before the third Friday of each month. Plaintiffs must make their contractually required payment of $1,332.00 to the arbitrator's retainer fund no later than August 26, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/27/10. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scurtu et al v. International Student Exchange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelia Grozav
Represented By: Robert A. Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Scurtu
Represented By: Robert A. Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Student Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendco, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality And Catering Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?