Mobile Alabama Associates, LLC v. Hoeppner Construction Corporation

Plaintiff: Mobile Alabama Associates, LLC
Defendant: Hoeppner Construction Corporation
Counter Claimant: Hoeppner Construction Corporation
Counter Defendant: Mobile Alabama Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00432
Filed: June 15, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Hoeppner Construction Corporation against Mobile Alabama Associates, LLC as follows: Original Judgment plus pre-judgment interest in the amount of $521,854.45, plus 12% interest since March 19, 2009; Attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $390,267.05, plus interest in the amount of 12% running from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/3/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
April 22, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 111 motion of MAA for renewed judgment as a matter of law or alternatively for new trial; granting Hoeppner's 121 motion for leave to supplement; finding that the amounts requested for attorneys' fees, expenses and pre-jud gment interest (Docs. 109 , 121 , 122 ) should be awarded; and directing Hoeppner to file a response to this order further detailing or explaining the amounts requested for post-judgment interest, along with a proposed order as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/22/2011. (mab)
March 18, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Hoeppner Construction Corporation against Mobile Alabama Associates, LLC as to Plf's claims & as to its counter-claim in the amount of $422,196.05 plus fees, costs & interest to be determined by the court after further submission by the parties. Plf's claims against Dft are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/18/09. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile Alabama Associates, LLC v. Hoeppner Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile Alabama Associates, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoeppner Construction Corporation
Represented By: Jason B. Nimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Hoeppner Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Mobile Alabama Associates, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?