Hattenstein v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Ronald L. Hattenstein, Jr.
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2007cv00470
Filed: June 29, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Butler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Ronald L. Hattenstein, Jr. 29 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees by Ronald L. Hattenstein, Jr.. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 8/13/09. (adk)
July 23, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Ronald L. Hattenstein, Jr. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/23/09. (adk)
March 17, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the report and recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 3/17/09. (adk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hattenstein v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Hattenstein, Jr.
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?