Williams et al v. Monroe County Board of Education, et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Williams, Sonya Richardson, Felicia Gibbs, Mary Preyear, Angela Chaney, Aaron Chaney, Daphne Martin, Jackie Davis, Tabitha Kidd-Fountain and Tangelia D. Yates
Defendant: Monroe County Board of Education, George Coker, Martha Jordan, Tony Powell, Patricia M. Black, William F. Andrews, Dennis Mixon and Lana Wilson
Case Number: 1:2007cv00561
Filed: August 8, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Monroe
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Dennis Mixon, George Coker, Lana Wilson, Martha Jordan, Patricia M. Black, Tony Powell, William F. Andrews against Nicky Williams, individually and on behalf of her minor son. Therefore, all the plaintiff's individual claims and those brought on behalf of her minor son J.W.are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 07/27/2009. (copy to pltf) (mab)
June 23, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Dfts' 107 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The motion is MOOT as to Sherry Millender as set out, & the motion is GRANTED as to Ms. Williams. Dfts' 114 Motion to Strike, 117 Motion to Strike are MOOT as set out. The c ourt ORDERS that Doc. 116 be sealed as set out. Ms. Williams may file a Third Amended Complaint on or before 7/14/09. No amended claims may be filed on behalf of Ms. Williams' minor son unless an attny appears on his behalf. In the event, Ms. Williams does not file her Third Amended Complaint on or before 7/14/09, final judgment will be entered in favor of dfts. The clerk is directed not to docket any further proffered documents from persons who are not parties. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/23/09. (copies mailed to Plf Nicky Williams on 6/23/09) (tot)
March 26, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 110 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of this court. The claims of plaintiff Sherry Millender against the defendants are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 03/26/2009. (mab)
March 10, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that plaintiff Sherry Millender's claims be dismissed as requested at discovery conference on 2/20/2009. Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 03/10/2009. (Copies to pltfs) (mab)
February 4, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 97 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this court. It is ORDERED that the 45 motion for class certification be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 02/04/2009. (mab)
January 14, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plfs' 45 MOTION for Class Certification be denied as set out. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/14/09. (copies mailed to Plfs Williams & Millender on 1/15/09) (tot)
January 13, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 93 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge as the opinion of this court. It is ORDERED that the claims of plaintiffs Felicia Gibbs, Tiffany Smith, Angela Chaney, Aaron Chaney, Tabitha Kidd-Fountain, Daffnie Martin, and Jacqueline Davis are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 01/10/2009. (mab)
December 17, 2008 93 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the claims of Plaintiffs Felicia Gibbs, Tiffany Smith, Angela & Aaron Chaney, Tabitha Kidd-Fountain, Daffnie Martin and Jacqueline Davis be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 1/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/17/2008. (copies mailed to pltfs 12/17/08) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Monroe County Board of Education, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Williams
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Richardson
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Gibbs
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Preyear
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Chaney
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Chaney
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Martin
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Davis
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Kidd-Fountain
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangelia D. Yates
Represented By: Joshua Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Coker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia M. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lana Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?