Taylor et al v. Holiday Isle, LLC

Plaintiff: Celestine F. Taylor, Jay Murray, Lisa Murray, John Gardner, Tracy Gardner, Richard Murray, III and Arthur Fitzner
Defendant: Holiday Isle, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00771
Filed: October 30, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2009 173 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Reclaro, Inc., Alan Mcleod, Arthur Drago, Arthur Fitzner, Brian Hennick, Celestine F. Taylor, Charles Campbell, Charles D Steinau, Donna M. Steinau, Gregory Woodfin, Jay Murray, John Gardner, Joseph Campus, III, Joseph Campus, IV , Kathy Drago, Kenneth R Thompson, Lisa Murray, Randall A Coggins, Raymond Hennick, Richard Murray, III, Robert Tortajada, Timothy I. Warren, Tracy Gardner against Holiday Isle, LLC in the amount of $2,315,199.96, inclusive of interest and attor ney's fees. Costs are taxed against defendant in accordance with, and in the manner set forth in, the arbitrator's award. The plaintiff-by-plaintiff awards (inclusive of damages and interest) are set out. Post-judgment interest will accrue at the statutory rate of 0.39%. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 10/29/09. (mpp) Copies to parties on 10/30/09.
September 28, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 152 Motion to Consolidate Civil Action 07-0430-KD-B with 07-0771-WS-M. Lead Case No.: 07-0771-WS-M, Member Case No.: 07-0430-KD-B.The Clerk is directed to extract documents 1-41 from Civil Action No. 07-0430-KD-B and to make those documents a part of the court file in Civil Action No. 07-0771-WS-M. All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 9/28/09. (tgw)
May 19, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 131 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 5/19/09. (tgw)
May 12, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Motion to Quash as further set out. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 5/12/09. (jlr)
May 1, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to the Motion 121 in Limine - It is DENIED with respect to Carissa Carisse, and her testimony will not be excluded at trial. As to the Meyer Realty representative, then, Defendants Motion in Limine under Rule 37(c)(1) is CARRIED TO TRIAL. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 5/1/09. Copies to parties. (mpp)
March 25, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on the following motions: GRANTING 57 Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Evidence & GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 58 Motion for Summary Judgment and 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court's rulings are set out on a claim-by-claim basis. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 3/24/09. Copies to parties on 3/25/09. (mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Holiday Isle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celestine F. Taylor
Represented By: A. Carson I. Nicolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Murray
Represented By: A. Carson I. Nicolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Murray
Represented By: A. Carson I. Nicolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gardner
Represented By: A. Carson I. Nicolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Gardner
Represented By: A. Carson I. Nicolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Murray, III
Represented By: A. Carson I. Nicolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Fitzner
Represented By: A. Carson I. Nicolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Isle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?