Jackson v. Winn Dixie, Inc.

Plaintiff: Markale Jackson
Defendant: Winn Dixie, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00014
Filed: January 10, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000rt Job Discrimination/Retaliation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 2/2/09. (tgw)
December 31, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion to Supplement the record; granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/31/08. (tgw)
December 29, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for Leave to File Surrebuttal; denying as moot 47 Motion for Extension of Time to respond. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/29/08. (tgw)
September 11, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 9/11/08. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Winn Dixie, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markale Jackson
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winn Dixie, Inc.
Represented By: Mieke A. Hemstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?