Hall v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Majorie A. Hall
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00101
Filed: February 19, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Majorie A. Hall against Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/22/08. (cmj)
November 20, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Majorie A. Hall, recommending this motion be granted and plaintiff receive attorney's fee in the amount o f $1378 under the EAJA Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/19/08. (cmj)
September 8, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT stating that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying plaintiff benefits be reversed and remanded pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/8/08. Copies to parties on 9/9/08.(mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Majorie A. Hall
Represented By: Colin Edward Kemmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?