White v. Boyd

Petitioner: James White
Respondent: Warden Boyd
Case Number: 1:2008cv00140
Filed: March 13, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by James White stating that White's Motion for a COA should be denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/21/09. (copy mailed to James White) (cmj)
September 8, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by James White stating that White's Motion for a COA should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/8/09. Copies to parties on 9/9/09. (mpp)
August 4, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT stating that this petition is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/4/09. Copies to parties. (mpp)
July 14, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James White, recommending that the petition be dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations. Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/13/09. (copy to petitioner) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?