McCorvey v. Smith

Plaintiff: Charles McCorvey
Defendant: Earl Smith
Case Number: 1:2008cv00151
Filed: March 19, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion to Vacate the Order to Not Allow the Petitioner to Proceed and IFP and Why the Respondent Summary Judgment Should Not be Granted. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/12/10. (Clerk mailed copy to Mr. McCorvey) (jal)
July 15, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion to Alter, Amend or Vacate Judgment. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 7/15/09. (tgw)
June 30, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 6/30/09. (tgw)
October 21, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff's objections are sustained in part, and overruled in part. The Report and Recommendation is adopted as the opinion of this Court insofar as it recommends the dismiss al of plaintiff's § 1983 malicious prosecution claim (Count Two) and 1983 false arrest claim (Count One) arising from the second seizure. The Motion to Dismiss (doc. 16) is granted as to those claims, and those claims are dismissed. As to t he § 1983 Fourth Amendment claim set forth in Count One and arising from the initial seizure and detention of plaintiff (prior to any order that he move the vehicle), the Report and Recommendation is overruled and the Motion to Dismiss is denied. Defendant is ordered to file an answer by 11/4/2008. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 10/21/08. (tgw)
September 16, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Earl Smith. It is recommended that Defendant's motion be granted, that this action be dismissed, and that judgment be entered in favor of Defendant Earl Smith and against Plaintiff Charles McCorvey on all claims. Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/16/08. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCorvey v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles McCorvey
Represented By: Jay Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?