Williams v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Brenda Williams
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00201
Filed: April 18, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Brenda Williams, recommending the motion for attorneys fees be granted as set out, and that plaintiff's attorney, Margaret A. Stone, be awarded an EAJA attorney's fee in the amount of $2682.68.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/7/09. (cmj)
March 18, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Brenda Williams, recommending the motion for attorneys fees be granted as set out, and that plaintiff's attorney, Margaret A. Stone, be awarded an EAJA attorney's fee in the amount of $2682.68. Objections to R&R due by 4/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/18/09. (cmj)
November 17, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Brenda Williams, recommending that the decision of the Commissioner be reversed, that this action be remanded, and that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Brenda Williams and against Defendant Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/14/08. (cmj)
October 30, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Brenda Williams, recommending that the decision of the Commissioner be reversed, that this action be remanded, and that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Brenda Williams and against Defendant Michael J. Astrue. Objections to R&R due by 11/14/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 10/30/08. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Williams
Represented By: Margaret A. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?