Crimson Yachts v. Motor Yacht et al

Plaintiff: Crimson Yachts
Defendant: Betty Lyn II Motor Yacht
Case Number: 1:2008cv00334
Filed: June 11, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Contract: Marine Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Marine-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2011 191 Opinion or Order of the Court Order transferring this action to the Southern District of Texas pursuant to Section 1404(a). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/19/2011. (tgw)
August 19, 2010 171 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 163 MOTION to Amend the Pretrial Order filed by Blyn II Holding, LLC. BLyn is ordered by 8/19/10 to file a brief addendum to the joint pretrial document (as set out). Upon filing of that document, it will be deemed incorporated into the final pretrial order. The plaintiff is ordered by 8/20/10 to file a short supplement to its trial brief addressing the matters included in BLyns addendum. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/19/10. (tgw)
July 30, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 157 Motion for Default Judgment & and to amend the joint pretrial order - the final paragraph of the Court's order on motion to strike 155 is modified to read as follows: "For the reasons set forth above, BLyns motion to s trike is granted. Those portions of the amended pleadings, (Docs. 146, 147), purporting to assert an affirmative defense of failure to plead fraud with particularity are stricken." Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/30/10. Copies to parties. (mpp)
July 6, 2010 155 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 150 MOTION to Strike 146 Answer to Counterclaim & 147 Answer to Complaint filed by Blyn II Holding, LLC. The amended pleadings, (Docs. 146, 147), are stricken. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/6/10. (tgw)
July 1, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 142 Motion to Stay; denying 151 Motion to Strike portions of BLyn's reply brief and for leave to file a sur-reply. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/1/10. (tgw)
May 25, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Motion for Summary Judgment; Crimson's motion to file a sur-reply 125 which has drawn no opposition from Encore, is granted. In light of this ruling, Crimson's alternative motion to partially strike Encore;s reply brief 125 is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/25/10. (mbp)
June 2, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 43 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint filed by Betty Lyn II Motor Yacht, Blyn II Holding, LLC. The defendant is ordered by 6/9/2009 to file these pleadings, to serve them on the plaintiff on or before June 9, and to immediately pursue service on the third-party defendants. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 6/2/09. (tgw)
February 26, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 Motion to Vacate arrest and to dismiss the in rem claims against the Betty Lyn. The in rem claims against the Betty Lyn alleged in the First Cause of Action of the complaint are DISMISSED. The arrest of the Betty Lyn is VACATED, and the plaintiff's appointment as substitute custodian is rescinded. The 30 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 2/26/09. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crimson Yachts v. Motor Yacht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crimson Yachts
Represented By: J. W. Goodloe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Lyn II Motor Yacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?