Daniels v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Gregory L. Daniels
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv00399
Filed: July 9, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Gregory L. Daniels, Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2010 Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/1/10.) and 26 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Gregory L. Daniels, Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/16/10. (Copy to Appellant and notified USCA) (jal)
March 1, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Gregory L. Daniels Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2010Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/1/10. (mailed a copy to Appellant). (jal)
February 19, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the decision of theCommissioner of Social Security, denying Plaintiff's claim for disability insurance benefits, be AFFIRMED. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 02/19/2010. (mab)
February 4, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying Plf's claim for period of disability & disability income benefits be AFFIRMED as set out. Objections to R&R due by 2/18/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/4/10. (copy mailed to Plf on 2/5/10) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?