Shinn v. City of Mobile

Plaintiff: Betty M. Shinn
Defendant: City of Mobile
Case Number: 1:2008cv00444
Filed: July 29, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000rt Job Discrimination/Retaliation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 72 Report and Recommendation. The Motion IFP (doc. 69) DENIED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/24/10. (Copy to Appellant) (jal)
March 22, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 69 to Deny the MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Betty M. Shinn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/22/10. (copy mailed to Appellant) (jal)
February 19, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of City of Mobile against Betty M. Shinn. All plaintiff's claims DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Costs are to be taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/19/2010. (copy to pltf) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinn v. City of Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty M. Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?