Kuithe v. Gulf Caribe Maritime, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Steve Kuithe
Defendant: Gulf Caribe Maritime, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00458
Filed: August 5, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Marine Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 46:688 Jones Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2010 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Findings & conclusions after bench trial. Plaintiff is awarded $560,981 (as set out). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/26/10. (tgw)
November 25, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion in Limine; denying 107 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 11/25/09. (tgw)
November 18, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion in Limine to exclude witnesses Whitacre and Zukowski; granting 122 Motion for Leave to File supplemental memorandum. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 11/17/09. (tgw)
November 17, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 134 Motion in Limine to exclude or limit the expert testimony of the defendant's expert, W.T. Ames. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 11/17/09. (tgw)
November 13, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 139 Motion for Sanctions as set out. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 11/13/09. Copies to parties. (mpp)
November 3, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 127 Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition. The motion to quash is not granted but is deemed MOOT WITH EXPLANATION (as set out). Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 11/3/09. (tgw)
October 5, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Compel; denying 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 56 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 57 Motion to Strike; granting 66 Motion for Leave to File report of Dr. Pearsall; granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Coast Guard records; denying as moot 74 Motion to Strike; granting 85 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 10/5/09. (tgw) Modified on 12/1/2009 (tgw).
September 29, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; denying 78 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 9/29/09. (tgw)
April 6, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 46 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Steve Kuithe. The Magistrate Judge's order 37 requiring the plaintiff to submit to an IME is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/6/09. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuithe v. Gulf Caribe Maritime, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Kuithe
Represented By: Louis R. Koerner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Caribe Maritime, Inc.
Represented By: E. Carroll Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?